Математика 4 класс Г.В. Дорофеев, Т.Н. Миракова, Т.Б. Бука

Математика 4 класс Г.В. Дорофеев, Т.Н. Миракова, Т.Б. Бука

авторы: , , .
издательство: "Просвещение" 2015 год

Раздел:

Номер №2

Выполни вычисления. Сделай проверку с помощью калькулятора.
1)
264 * 18;
763 * 24;
485 * 32;
209 * 67;
309 * 70;
516 * 30;
188 * 3600;
234 * 1800.
2)
483 : 23;
724 : 14;
540 : 45;
588 : 28;
5580 : 90;
4320 : 40;
42500 : 170;
55200 : 920.
3)
516 * 276;
328 * 465;
304 * 185;
855 * 243;
293 * 890;
916 * 304;
415 * 327;
792 * 105;
84 * 1205;
27 * 3008.

Решение 1

264 * 18 = 4752
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 264, y: 18}$

 
763 * 24 = 18312
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 763, y: 24}$

 
485 * 32 = 15520
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 485, y: 32}$

 
209 * 67 = 14003
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 209, y: 67}$

 
309 * 70 = 21630
$\snippet{name: op_column, sign: '×', x: '309  ', y: '70', z: '21630 '}$

 
516 * 30 = 15480
$\snippet{name: op_column, sign: '×', x: '516  ', y: '30', z: '15480 '}$

 
188 * 3600 = 676800
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 188, y: 36}$

 
234 * 1800 = 421200
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 234, y: 18}$

Решение 2

483 : 23 = 21
$\snippet{name: long_division, x: 483, y: 23}$

 
724 : 14 = 53
$\snippet{name: long_division, x: 724, y: 14}$

 
540 : 45 = 12
$\snippet{name: long_division, x: 540, y: 45}$

 
588 : 28 = 21
$\snippet{name: long_division, x: 588, y: 28}$

 
5580 : 90 = 558 : 9 = 62
$\snippet{name: long_division, x: 558, y: 9}$

 
4320 : 40 = 432 : 4 = 108
$\snippet{name: long_division, x: 432, y: 4}$

 
42500 : 170 = 4250 : 17 = 250
$\snippet{name: long_division, x: 4250, y: 17}$

 
55200 : 920 = 5520 : 92 = 60
$\snippet{name: long_division, x: 520, y: 92}$

Решение 3

516 * 276 = 142416
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 516, y: 276}$

 
328 * 465 = 152520
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 328, y: 465}$

 
304 * 185 = 56240
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 304, y: 185}$

 
855 * 243 = 207765
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 855, y: 243}$

 
293 * 890 = 260770
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 293, y: 890}$

 
916 * 304 = 278464
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 916, y: 304}$

 
415 * 327 = 135705
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 415, y: 327}$

 
792 * 105 = 83160
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 792, y: 105}$

 
84 * 1205 = 101220
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 1205, y: 84}$

 
27 * 3008 = 81216
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 3008, y: 27}$