Математика 4 класс Г.В. Дорофеев, Т.Н. Миракова, Т.Б. Бука

Математика 4 класс Г.В. Дорофеев, Т.Н. Миракова, Т.Б. Бука

авторы: , , .
издательство: "Просвещение" 2015 год

Раздел:

Номер №5

Выполни действия.
720 * 9385 : 5 * (1029980);
(811 + 4189) : 1000 * 317600;
3100 : (67 * 28592 * 3) + 2599;
371 * 508 * (42 * 100616 * 4);
(95 * 6394 * 56 + 279) : 1000;
(5304052584) * 90 + 58960.

Решение

720 * 9385 : 5 * (1029980) = 648077 * 49 = 64803773 = 2707
1)
$\snippet{name: op_column, sign: '-', x: '1029', y: '980', z: '49'}$
;
2)
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 720, y: 9}$
;
3)
$\snippet{name: long_division, x: 385, y: 5}$
;
4)
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 77, y: 49}$
;
5)
$\snippet{name: op_column, sign: '-', x: '6480', y: '3773', z: '2707'}$
.
 
(811 + 4189) : 1000 * 317600 = 5000 : 1000 * 317600 = 5 * 317600 = 1585600 = 985
1)
$\snippet{name: op_column, sign: '+', x: '4189', y: '811', z: '5000'}$
;
2) 5000 : 1000 = 5;
3)
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 317, y: 5}$
;
4)
$\snippet{name: op_column, sign: '-', x: '1585', y: '600', z: '985'}$
.
 
3100 : (67 * 28592 * 3) + 2599 = 3100 : (18761776) + 2599 = 3100 : 100 + 2599 = 31 + 2599 = 2630
1)
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 67, y: 28}$
;
2)
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 592, y: 3}$
;
3) 18761776 = 100;
4) 3100 : 100 = 31;
5) 31 + 2599 = 2630.
 
371 * 508 * (42 * 100616 * 4) = 185508 * (42002464) = 185508 * 1736 = 1855013888 = 4662
1) 42 * 100 = 4200;
2)
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 616, y: 4}$
;
3)
$\snippet{name: op_column, sign: '-', x: '4200', y: '2464', z: '1736'}$
;
4)
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 371, y: 50}$
;
5)
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 1736, y: 8}$
;
6)
$\snippet{name: op_column, sign: '-', x: '18550', y: '13888', z: '4662'}$
.
 
(95 * 6394 * 56 + 279) : 1000 = (59855264 + 279) : 1000 = (721 + 279) : 1000 = 1000 : 1000 = 1
1)
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 95, y: 63}$
;
2)
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 94, y: 56}$
;
3)
$\snippet{name: op_column, sign: '-', x: '5985', y: '5264', z: '721'}$
;
4)
$\snippet{name: op_column, sign: '+', x: '721', y: '279', z: '1000'}$
;
5) 1000 : 1000 = 1.
 
(5304052584) * 90 + 58960 = 456 * 90 + 58960 = 41040 + 58960 = 100000
1)
$\snippet{name: op_column, sign: '-', x: '53040', y: '52584', z: '456'}$
;
2)
$\snippet{name: column_multiplication, x: 456, y: 90}$
;
3)
$\snippet{name: op_column, sign: '+', x: '41040', y: '58960', z: '100000'}$
.